California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2005 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2014

Amended

Bill August 14, 2014
Bill April 24, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014