California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2007 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2014

Amended

Bill July 2, 2014
Bill May 1, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014