|
07/07/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 88, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:15 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4141.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 5003.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|