California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2009 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill June 30, 2014

Chaptered

Bill July 9, 2014

Amended

Bill April 10, 2014
Bill March 27, 2014