|
09/21/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 527, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 8. Page 6381.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 6. Page 4609.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
Reconsideration granted. (Page 4703.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 4. Page 4703.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
April 30-Motion to reconsider continued.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2014
|
Motion to reconsider continued until next Legislative day.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 43. Noes 5. Page 4362.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Muratsuchi.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 4280.) From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (April 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2014
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|