LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2015
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2015
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2015
Action History
Assembly
05/23/2014
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Assembly
04/09/2014
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Assembly
04/02/2014
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 1.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Assembly
03/03/2014
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Assembly
02/21/2014
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
Assembly
02/20/2014
Read first time. To print.