California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2016 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/29/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2016CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 809 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 29, 2014 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 29, 2014 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 21, 2014 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 25, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 19, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 2, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 1, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 21, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Campos FEBRUARY 20, 2014 An act to add Section 51900.6 to the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2016, Campos. Pupil instruction: sexual abuse and sexual assault awareness and prevention. Existing law requires the State Department of Education to prepare and distribute to school districts guidelines for the preparation of comprehensive health education plans, and requires approval of district plans to be made in accordance with rules and regulations adopted by the State Board of Education. Existing law establishes the Instructional Quality Commission and requires the commission to, among other things, recommend curriculum frameworks to the state board. This bill would require the state board, based upon recommendations by the Superintendent of Public Instruction, to consider including age-appropriate content for kindergarten and grades 1 to 12, inclusive, in sexual abuse and sexual assault awareness and prevention in the next revision of the health content standards. The bill would also require the state board, based upon recommendations by the commission, to consider including information in sexual abuse and sexual assault awareness and prevention in the Health Framework for California Public Schools when next revised. The bill would authorize school districts, county offices of education, and charter schools to provide age-appropriate instruction, pursuant to the content standards adopted by the state board, for kindergarten and grades 1 to 12, inclusive, as applicable, in sexual abuse and sexual assault awareness and prevention. The bill would provide a procedure for excusing a pupil from that instruction. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 51900.6 is added to the Education Code, to read: 51900.6. (a) (1) The state board shall, based upon recommendations by the Superintendent, consider including age-appropriate content for kindergarten and grades 1 to 12, inclusive, in sexual abuse and sexual assault awareness and prevention in the next revision of the health content standards. (2) The state board shall, based upon recommendations by the Instructional Quality Commission, consider including information in sexual abuse and sexual assault awareness and prevention in the Health Framework for California Public Schools when next revised. (b) (1) School districts, county offices of education, and charter schools may provide age-appropriate instruction, pursuant to the content standards adopted by the state board under subdivision (a), for kindergarten and grades 1 to 12, inclusive, as applicable, in sexual abuse and sexual assault awareness and prevention. (2) Upon written request of the pupil's parent or legal guardian, a pupil in kindergarten or grades 1 to 12, inclusive, shall be excused from taking instruction in sexual abuse and sexual assault awareness and prevention established pursuant to this section.