Assembly | 05/05/2014 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2014 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4633.) In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2014 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2014 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2014 | Read first time. To print. |