Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4473.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|