|
09/15/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 336, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4607.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4849.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|