LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2029
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2029
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2029
Compare Versions
AB2029 Enrolled August 29, 2014
AB2029 Amended July 1, 2014
AB2029 Amended June 17, 2014
AB2029 Amended May 8, 2014
AB2029 Amended April 30, 2014
AB2029 Amended March 28, 2014
AB2029 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB2029 Enrolled August 29, 2014
AB2029 Amended July 1, 2014
AB2029 Amended June 17, 2014
AB2029 Amended May 8, 2014
AB2029 Amended April 30, 2014
AB2029 Amended March 28, 2014
AB2029 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare