|
09/29/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 810, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6239.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6243.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4613.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4377.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 5012.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2014
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|