Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5178.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|