California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2040 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2014

Amended

Bill August 12, 2014
Bill June 25, 2014
Bill May 23, 2014