Assembly | 05/23/2014 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2014 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4633.) | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2014 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 7). | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2014 | Read first time. To print. |