Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 17. Page 5333.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Reconsideration granted. (Page 4924.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4924.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2014
|
May 14-Motion to reconsider continued.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 48. Noes 12. Page 4854.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Gomez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2014
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|