California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2050 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Amended

Bill June 30, 2014
Bill June 10, 2014
Bill May 23, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014
Bill March 26, 2014