California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2051 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2014

Amended

Bill August 14, 2014
Bill August 5, 2014
Bill June 11, 2014
Bill May 22, 2014
Bill April 29, 2014