|
08/13/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 95, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1601.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 917.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|