California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2064 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2014

Amended

Bill August 11, 2014
Bill June 12, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014