California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2098 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill July 2, 2014

Chaptered

Bill July 21, 2014

Amended

Bill May 29, 2014
Bill March 24, 2014