California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2099 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 18, 2014
Bill July 2, 2014
Bill May 23, 2014
Bill May 7, 2014
Bill April 24, 2014
Bill April 10, 2014