California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2100 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill July 8, 2014

Chaptered

Bill July 21, 2014

Amended

Bill June 10, 2014
Bill April 24, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014