Assembly | 05/23/2014 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2014 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2014 | Read first time. To print. |