|
09/18/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 421, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 6111.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4502.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 2. Page 4331.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|