California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2109 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2014

Amended

Bill August 21, 2014
Bill May 6, 2014
Bill March 24, 2014