LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2110
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2110
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2110
Compare Versions
AB2110 Amended July 2, 2014
AB2110 Amended June 18, 2014
AB2110 Amended April 21, 2014
AB2110 Amended March 25, 2014
AB2110 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB2110 Amended July 2, 2014
AB2110 Amended June 18, 2014
AB2110 Amended April 21, 2014
AB2110 Amended March 25, 2014
AB2110 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare