California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2117 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2014

Amended

Bill August 4, 2014
Bill June 18, 2014