|
07/18/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 148, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/18/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4191.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5008.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|