California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2121 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2014

Amended

Bill July 1, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014