Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 20. Page 5263.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|