California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2130 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill June 30, 2014

Chaptered

Bill June 28, 2014

Amended

Bill May 1, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014
Bill March 20, 2014