|
09/27/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 677, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 6101.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 4459.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 5013.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|