California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2139 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2014

Amended

Bill August 18, 2014
Bill May 13, 2014
Bill April 2, 2014