California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2141 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2014

Amended

Bill August 18, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill May 23, 2014
Bill April 7, 2014