California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2148 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 17, 2014

Amended

Bill July 2, 2014
Bill June 19, 2014
Bill April 10, 2014