|
09/27/2014
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 6102.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4463.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5005.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|