LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2160
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2160
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2160
Compare Versions
AB2160 Chaptered September 27, 2014
AB2160 Enrolled August 22, 2014
AB2160 Amended August 18, 2014
AB2160 Amended June 18, 2014
AB2160 Amended May 23, 2014
AB2160 Amended May 5, 2014
AB2160 Amended April 10, 2014
AB2160 Amended April 1, 2014
AB2160 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB2160 Chaptered September 27, 2014
AB2160 Enrolled August 22, 2014
AB2160 Amended August 18, 2014
AB2160 Amended June 18, 2014
AB2160 Amended May 23, 2014
AB2160 Amended May 5, 2014
AB2160 Amended April 10, 2014
AB2160 Amended April 1, 2014
AB2160 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare