California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2161 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2014

Amended

Bill August 5, 2014
Bill April 23, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014