Assembly | 06/05/2014 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2014 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 8). | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2014 | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2014 | Read first time. To print. |