California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2173 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill June 18, 2014

Chaptered

Bill June 25, 2014

Amended

Bill April 30, 2014
Bill April 22, 2014
Bill March 19, 2014