Senate | 08/21/2014 | Joint Rule 61 refused suspension. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4732.). | ||
Senate | 08/18/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2014 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). | ||
Senate | 06/18/2014 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 11). | ||
Senate | 05/22/2014 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2014 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2014 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 4939.) | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 23). | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2014 | Read first time. To print. |