Assembly | 02/03/2014 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2014 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2013 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2013 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2013 | Read first time. To print. |