|
08/21/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 236, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4377.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4600.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|