California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2216 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Amended

Bill July 2, 2014
Bill May 23, 2014
Bill May 1, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014