LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2225
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2225
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2225
Action History
Assembly
06/05/2014
From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Assembly
04/30/2014
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Assembly
03/06/2014
Referred to Com. on ED.
Assembly
02/21/2014
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
Assembly
02/20/2014
Read first time. To print.