Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5202.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4633.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|