California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2231 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2014

Amended

Bill August 21, 2014
Bill August 18, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill June 19, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014
Bill March 24, 2014