LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2264
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2264
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2264
Compare Versions
AB2264 Chaptered September 20, 2014
AB2264 Enrolled August 29, 2014
AB2264 Amended August 4, 2014
AB2264 Amended July 1, 2014
AB2264 Amended June 15, 2014
AB2264 Amended May 6, 2014
AB2264 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB2264 Chaptered September 20, 2014
AB2264 Enrolled August 29, 2014
AB2264 Amended August 4, 2014
AB2264 Amended July 1, 2014
AB2264 Amended June 15, 2014
AB2264 Amended May 6, 2014
AB2264 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare