|
09/20/2014
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4932.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator DeSaulnier.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5112.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|